Case: 14-0974
14-0974
11/24/2014
Petition for Review originally filed as 53.7(f)
ERIC YOLLICK
JJJJ WALKER, LLC, DYNAFAB USA, LLC, RENAISSANCE PROPERTIES OF TEXAS, LLC, PRIYA PROPERTIES, LLC, BD TEXAS, LLC AND KW HOSPITAL ACQUISITION, LLC
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
02/09/2016 | Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filed | Petitioner | Reply in Support of Motion for Rehearing, filed on behalf of Eric Yollick. | |||||
02/01/2016 | Response to Motion for Rehearing | Respondent | Response to Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of JJJ Walker, LLC, et al. | |||||
11/18/2015 | Motion for Rehearing | Rehearing filed in Petition for Review | Petitioner's Motion for Rehearing. On behalf of Eric Yollick. |
| ||||
09/16/2015 | Reply Brief | Petitioner | Petitioner's Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Eric Yollick. | |||||
08/20/2015 | Brief on the Merits | Respondent | Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of JJJJ Walker, LLC, et al. | |||||
07/01/2015 | Brief on the Merits | Petitioner | Petitioner's Brief on the Merits. On behalf of Eric Yollick | |||||
03/31/2015 | Reply to Response | Petitioner | Reply in support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of Eric Yollick. | |||||
03/16/2015 | Response to Petition | Respondent | Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of JJJJ Walker, LLC. | |||||
01/06/2015 | Petition for Review | Petitioner | Petition for Review filed on behalf of Eric Yollick. |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
05/06/2016 | Notice sent to Court of Appeals | |
| |||||
05/06/2016 | Motion for Rehearing - Disposed | Denied | |
| ||||
02/09/2016 | Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filed | Reply in Support of Motion for Rehearing, filed on behalf of Eric Yollick. | ||||||
02/01/2016 | Response to Motion for Rehearing | Response to Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of JJJ Walker, LLC, et al. | ||||||
01/19/2016 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Response disposed | Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Rehearing, filed on behalf of JJJJ Walker, LLC, et al., has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Response to Motion for Rehearing is due on February 1, 2016. | | |||||
01/19/2016 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Response | Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Rehearing, filed on behalf of JJJJ Walker, LLC, et al. | ||||||
01/08/2016 | Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response | Requested response to motion for rehearing due no later than January 25, 2016. |
| |||||
11/24/2015 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |||||
11/18/2015 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner's Motion for Rehearing. On behalf of Eric Yollick. |
| |||||
10/28/2015 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing disposed | Filing granted | Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Motion for Rehearing, filed on behalf of Eric Yollick has been granted. Further requests for extensions of time for this filing will be disfavored. Motion for Rehearing is due November 18, 2015. |
| ||||
10/28/2015 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing | Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Motion for Rehearing, filed on behalf of Eric Yollick. | ||||||
10/23/2015 | Petition for Review disposed | Denied | |
| ||||
09/16/2015 | Reply Brief | Petitioner's Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Eric Yollick. | ||||||
08/24/2015 | Motion for Extension of Time disposed. | Filing granted | Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioners Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Eric Yollick has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Reply brief due September 18, 2015. |
| ||||
08/21/2015 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed | Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioners Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Eric Yollick. | ||||||
08/20/2015 | Brief on the Merits | Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of JJJJ Walker, LLC, et al. | ||||||
08/03/2015 | Case Record Filed | Electronica Appellate Record received. | | |||||
07/13/2015 | Motion for Extension of Time disposed. | Filing granted | Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondents' Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of JJJJ Walker, LLC, et al. has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Respondents' brief is due August 20, 2015; Reply brief is due September 4, 2015. |
| ||||
07/13/2015 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed | Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondents' Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of JJJJ Walker, LLC, et al. | ||||||
07/01/2015 | Brief on the Merits | Petitioner's Brief on the Merits. On behalf of Eric Yollick | ||||||
05/05/2015 | Motion for Extension of Time disposed. | Filing granted | Motion for Extension of Time is granted. Petitioner's Brief on the Merits is due July 1, 2015. Further requests for extensions of time for this filing will be disfavored. Respondent's Brief is due July 21, 2015. Reply Brief is due August 5, 2015. |
| ||||
05/05/2015 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed | Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Eric Yollick. | ||||||
05/01/2015 | Record Requested in Petition for Review | Record requested from the 14th COA | | |||||
05/01/2015 | Brief on the Merits Requested | Brief on the merits requested: Petitioner's brief due no later than June 1, 2015; Reponse brief due June 22, 2015; Reply brief due July 7, 2015. |
| |||||
03/31/2015 | Reply to Response | Reply in support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of Eric Yollick. | ||||||
03/16/2015 | Response to Petition | Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of JJJJ Walker, LLC. | ||||||
02/13/2015 | Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response | Response Requested to Petition for Review due on March 16, 2015. |
| |||||
01/13/2015 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |||||
01/07/2015 | Response Waiver filed | Response Waiver filed on behalf of JJJJ Walker, LLC, et al. | ||||||
01/06/2015 | Petition for Review | Petition for Review filed on behalf of Eric Yollick. |
| |||||
11/24/2014 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposed | Filing granted | Petition is due January 7, 2015 |
| ||||
11/24/2014 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed | Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Eric Yollick. |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
05/06/2016 | Case Stored | Case stored. | e-stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Priya Properties, LLC | Respondent | Ms. Dori Goldman Mr. Marc S. Tabolsky R. Michael McCauley Jr. Mr. Gene M. Zona Jones II Mr. Andrew Raymond Seger Mr. Patrick A. Zummo Mr. Timothy Thomas Pridmore |
BD Texas, LLC | Respondent | Mr. Marc S. Tabolsky Mr. Patrick A. Zummo Ms. Dori Goldman R. Michael McCauley Jr. Mr. Gene M. Zona Jones II Mr. Timothy Thomas Pridmore Mr. Andrew Raymond Seger |
Yollick, Eric | Petitioner | The Honorable Kristin Bays Mr. Roger D. Townsend Ms. Jennifer Ruth Josephson Mr. J. Randal Bays |
KW Hospital Acquisition, LLC | Respondent | Mr. Gene M. Zona Jones II Mr. Patrick A. Zummo Mr. Marc S. Tabolsky R. Michael McCauley Jr. Ms. Dori Goldman Mr. Timothy Thomas Pridmore Mr. Andrew Raymond Seger |
JJJJ Walker, LLC | Respondent | Mr. Patrick A. Zummo Ms. Dori Goldman R. Michael McCauley Jr. Mr. Marc S. Tabolsky Mr. Timothy Thomas Pridmore Mr. Andrew Raymond Seger Mr. Gene M. Zona Jones II |
Renaissance Properties of Texas, LLC | Respondent | Mr. Andrew Raymond Seger Mr. Marc S. Tabolsky Mr. Patrick A. Zummo R. Michael McCauley Jr. Mr. Gene M. Zona Jones II Ms. Dori Goldman Mr. Timothy Thomas Pridmore |
Dynafab USA, LLC | Respondent | R. Michael McCauley Jr. Mr. Marc S. Tabolsky Mr. Gene M. Zona Jones II Mr. Andrew Raymond Seger Ms. Dori Goldman Mr. Patrick A. Zummo Mr. Timothy Thomas Pridmore |
Court of Appeals Information:
14-13-00161-CV
Reverse & Remand
447 SW3d 453, 09-25-14
14th Court of Appeals
Honorable Tracy K. Christopher
Trial Court Information
281st District Court
Harris
Honorable Sylvia A. Matthews
2010-41034