judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MITCHELL (GEORGE) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38150
Short Caption:MITCHELL (GEORGE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C168744Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/09/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/09/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 01-11551
07/23/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Response due from attorney Cristina A. Hinds: 20 days in which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiciton. 01-12477
08/17/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 01-14020
09/06/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed August 17, 2001. Counsel for appellant shall have 20 days from the date of this order to file the response. 01-15016
09/06/2001MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. 01-15044
10/02/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP02-MS/RR/NB 01-16531
10/30/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-16634
10/30/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/09/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 2, 2001. 01-16634