judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

MARRS MCLEAN v. STATE OF TEXAS

Case: A-299
A-299
08/08/1944
Application for Writ of Error
MARRS MCLEAN
STATE OF TEXAS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/24/1944Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
11/09/1944Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
11/07/1944Motion for RehearingPetitioner
08/09/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
08/08/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/24/1944Supplemental Brief filed
11/09/1944Brief in Support of Petition
11/07/1944Motion for RehearingOverruled
08/09/1944Response to Petition
08/08/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledRefused
08/08/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
State of TexasRespondent
Marrs McLeanPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information