Case: 03-20-00391-CV
03-20-00391-CV
07/31/2020
Miscellaneous/other civil
Glenn Hegar, Comptroller of Public Accounts of the State of Texas; and Ken Paxton, Attorney General of the State of Texas
Black, Mann, and Graham, L.L.P.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/08/2021 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellee |
| ||
12/07/2020 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellant |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
04/20/2021 | Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||
04/16/2021 | Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed |
| |||
04/07/2021 | Case ready to be set | | |||
03/11/2021 | Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||
03/11/2021 | Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed |
| |||
03/08/2021 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested |
| |||
01/19/2021 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||
01/19/2021 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||
12/17/2020 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||
12/17/2020 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||
12/07/2020 | Brief filed - oral argument requested |
| |||
11/30/2020 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||
11/30/2020 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||
10/15/2020 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||
10/15/2020 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||
09/22/2020 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||
09/22/2020 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||
08/31/2020 | Clerks record filed |
| |||
08/25/2020 | Exhibits filed | | |||
08/25/2020 | Reporters record filed |
| |||
08/25/2020 | Response filed | | |||
08/25/2020 | No payment arrangements made with trial court clerk for record |
| |||
08/24/2020 | Letter filed |
| |||
08/20/2020 | Notice of late record |
| |||
08/10/2020 | Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record |
| |||
08/10/2020 | Docketing statement filed | | |||
07/31/2020 | Fee paid | | |||
07/31/2020 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/07/2021 | At Issue | Holding |
05/12/2021 | Status | Appellant reply brief due |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Ken Paxton, Attorney General of the State of Texas | Appellant | Ms. Brittney Johnston Ms. Angela Angotti |
Black, Mann, and Graham, L.L.P. | Appellee | Mr. Rich Moore III Mr. Doug Sigel |
Glenn Hegar, Comptroller of Public Accounts of the State of Texas | Appellant | Ms. Angela Angotti Ms. Brittney Johnston |
Trial Court Information
261st District Court
Travis
Honorable Jan Soifer
D-1-GN-19-001725
Michelle Williamson