judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

AAARMS, INC. v. JEANENE SULLIVAN

Case Heading (06-264)
Case Number:06-264Case Docketed On:11/17/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Albany CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Code of Civil Procedure (Title 1)
Short Title:AAARMS, INC. v. JEANENE SULLIVAN
Full Title:AAARMS, INC., Appellant (Defendant), v. JEANENE SULLIVAN, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantAAARMS, Inc. Pro Se
AppelleeJeanene Sullivan Pro Se

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/17/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/17/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court. Delay in docketing case occurred because appellant was advised 11/01/06 she could not represent another party and was looking for an attorney.Notice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
11/17/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
11/17/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/13/2006Notice-Incoming - Other. Filed amendment to notice of appeal.Notice-IncomingOtherFinal
01/03/2007Order - Denying request of non-attorney to represent corporation.OrderDenyFinal
01/23/2007Order - Dismiss - want of prosecutionOrderDismiss - want of prosecutionFinal
01/26/2007Event - Phone Call. Received call from Ms. King regarding order dismissing. She said that when she filed her notice of appeal, she filed the original and six copies of her brief in the trial court. Index indicates "Brief of Appellant" was filed. She was advised that a brief for a case appealed to the Supreme Court is filed in this court and she is unable to represent a corporation.EventPhone CallFinal
02/08/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal