judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TRAVIS (SAMUEL) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38149
Short Caption:TRAVIS (SAMUEL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C174347Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/09/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/09/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) 01-11549
07/25/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 5/7/01; 5/21/01 through 5/23/01; and 6/20/01. Court Reporter: Lisa Makowski and Dina Dalton. Filed in district court on: July 20, 2001. 01-12603
08/17/2001TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: May 7, 2001, May 22, 2001 and May 23, 2001. Court Reporter: Lisa Makowski. 01-14008
08/17/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 01-14019
09/06/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Court reporter or recorder Dina Dalton shall file the requested transcripts within 10 days of this order or show cause why he should not be sanctioned. The motion for an extension of time is granted. The fast track statement and appendix shall be filed and served within 30 days of this order. 01-15052
10/08/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 01-16856
10/18/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: June 20, 2001. Court Reporter: Dina Dalton. 01-17595
10/30/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed October 8, 2001. Appellant's counsel shall have 20 days from the date of this order to file and serve the fast track statement and appendix. 01-18171
11/21/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 01-19616
12/10/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Court reporter or recorder Dina Dalton shall file the requested transcript within 10 days of this order or show cause why she should not be sanctioned. The motion for an extension of time filed November 21, 2001, is granted. The fast track statement and appendix shall be filed and served within 30 days of this order. 01-20634
01/11/2002MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 02-00816
02/07/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. and Imposing Sanctions. On December 10, 2001, this court ordered court reporter Dina Dalton to file the May 21, 2001, transcript on or before December 20, 2001, or show cause why she should not be sanctioned. Ms. Dalton has failed to respond to our order. We conclude that a monetary sanction is appropriate. Ms. Dalton shall pay $500 to the Supreme Court Law Library and provide the clerk of this court with proof of payment within 20 days. Further, Ms. Dalton shall file and serve the requested transcript within 10 days of the date of this order or show cause why she should not be sanctioned further. Counsel for appellant shall have 20 days from the filing of the transcript to file and serve the fast track statement and appendix. 02-02477
05/31/2002Order/CounselFiled Order/Sanctions. Ms. Dalton has again failed to respond to this court's order. We conclude that the imposition of any additional monetary sanctions ia appropriate. Ms. Dalton shall personally pay the sum of $500.00 to the Supreme Court Law Library and provide the clerk of this court with an affidavit or certificate verifying that payment has been made within 20 days of the date of this order. fn1[This amount is in addition to the previous sanction of $500.00, which is still unpaid and overdue.] Ms. Dalton shall file and serve the requested transcripts within 10 days of this order or show cause why Ms. Dalton should not be sanctioned further, including referral to the Nevada Court Reporters Association. 02-09573
07/22/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The transcript from May 21, 2001, has still not been filed. This court has repeatedly ordered court reporter Dina Dalton to file the transcript, and ms. Dalton has failed to respond to any of this court's orders. Briefing in this appeal has now been delayed for a year because of Ms. Dalton's neglect and dilatory actions. We refer this matter to the Nevada Court Reporters Association for the investigation of Ms. Dalton and the imposition of possible disciplinary measures. Appellant, respondent and the district court shall follow the procedure outlined in NRAP 9(d) for preparation of a statement of the proceedings. Counsel for appellant shall have 60 days from the date of this order to file a supplemental appendix containing the statement of the proceedings as approved by the district court. 02-12495
09/23/2002MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Remand for New Trial and Order to Show Cause. 02-16419
10/07/2002MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Appellant's Motion for New Trial and Order to Show Cause. 02-17249
10/10/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. The motion filed on September 23, 2002 is denied. Counsel for appellant shall have 60 days from the date of this order within which to file a supplemental appendix containing the statement of the proceedings as approved by the district court. 02-17576
12/24/2002MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 02-21992
01/09/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed December 24, 2002. Counsel is however cautioned that no further extensions shall be granted for the filing of the supplemental appendix. Counsel for appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file the appendix or show cause why counsel for appellant should not be sanctioned. 03-00429
02/12/2003MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 03-02482
05/19/2003MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Affidavit in Support of Supreme Court Inquiry. 03-08417
10/10/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Directing Preparation of Statement of Proceedings pursuant to NRAP 9(d). Craig shall have thirty (30) days from the date of this order within which to prepare, file in the district court, and serve upon counsel for the State a statement of the evidence or proceedings pursuant to NRAP 9(d), or show cause why she should not be sanctioned in the amount of $1,000.00 for failure to comply with this court's orders. Within ten (10) days after service of appellant's proposed statement, counsel for the State shall file in the district court and serve upon counsel for appellant any objections or proposed amendments to the statement. Thereafter, the district court shall have ten (10) days within which to settle and approve the statement and to direct the clerk of the district court to include the statement in the trial court record. Craig shall file and serve the fast track statement and appendix in this court on or before December 12, 2003. This court expects counsel for the parties and the district court to reconstruct the record of the trial court proceedings in this matter with all due dispatch and from the best available means. 03-16868
12/15/2003Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 03-20791
12/15/2003AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 03-20792
01/05/2004Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 04-00184
03/05/2004Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP04S-MS/RR/WM 04-04160
03/30/2004RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 04-04287
03/30/2004Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/12/2004RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 1, 2004. 04-04287