judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-7329
A-7329
05/08/1959
MISC PETITION
COASTAL STATES GAS PRODUCING COMPANY, ET AL.
HAROLD BANNWORTH AND ARTHUR BANNWORTH, JOHN H. MILLER, HON. JOHN H. MILLER, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/02/1959Motion for RehearingRespondent
06/24/1959Exhibits in case/cause filed
06/22/1959Brief on the MeritsRespondent
06/22/1959Response to PetitionRespondent
05/27/1959Exhibits in case/cause filedRelator
05/26/1959Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
05/21/1959Reply to ResponseRelator
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/16/1959Order from Lower Court filed
12/11/1959Response to Motion filedOverruled
11/04/1959Dissenting opinion issued.
11/02/1959Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/21/1959Opinion issued
09/04/1959Response to Motion filed
06/24/1959Exhibits in case/cause filed
06/22/1959Brief on the Merits
06/22/1959Response to Petition
05/27/1959Exhibits in case/cause filed
05/26/1959Supplemental Brief filed
05/21/1959Reply to Response
05/19/1959Response to Motion filed
05/08/1959Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamusFiling granted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Hon. John H. Miller, et al.Respondent
Coastal States Gas Producing Company, et al.Relator
John H. MillerRespondent
Harold Bannworth and Arthur BannworthRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information