judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas 6th Court Of Appeals Record

Waymon Scott Hartwell and HHH Farms, LLC v. Lone Star, PCA

Case: 06-17-00030-CV
06-17-00030-CV
02/21/2017
Injunction
Waymon Scott Hartwell and HHH Farms, LLC
Lone Star, PCA
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Document
06/01/2017Electronic reply brief filedAppellee
05/22/2017Electronic reply brief filedAppellant
05/02/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
05/01/2017Brief received - oral argument requestedAppellee
04/11/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
04/10/2017Brief received - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Document
08/16/2018Notice received
08/09/2018Mandate issued
07/06/2018Motion to dismiss disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/20/2017Order issuedAbated
10/10/2017Suggestion of bankruptcy filed
08/18/2017Petition for review filed in Supreme Court
07/18/2017Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
07/13/2017Motion for rehearing filed
07/11/2017Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/06/2017Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing filed
06/21/2017Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/21/2017Order entered
06/20/2017Motion disposedMotion or Writ No Action Taken
06/16/2017Motion filed
06/01/2017Electronic reply brief filed
05/31/2017Motion disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/30/2017Submitted
05/25/2017Motion filed
05/22/2017Electronic reply brief filed
05/09/2017Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied
05/02/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested
05/02/2017Case ready to be set
05/01/2017Brief received - oral argument requested
04/11/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested
04/10/2017Brief received - oral argument requested
04/04/2017Electronic Motion for extension of time to file brief dispMotion or Writ Granted
03/28/2017Response filed
03/27/2017Electronic Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
03/07/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed
03/06/2017Clerks record received
03/03/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed
03/03/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed
02/21/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/09/2018Case StoredCase stored
08/09/2024RetentionDate civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Lone Star, PCAAppelleeMark Domel
N. Lance Bryan
Stephanie E. Kaiser
Waymon Scott Hartwell and HHH Farms, LLCAppellantCarling Nguyen
William L. Wolf
Trial Court Information
336th District Court
Fannin
Honorable Laurine Blake
CV-17-42985
Charla Reamy