judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-7326
A-7326
05/08/1959
Application for Writ of Error
STATE OF TEXAS, ACTING BY AND THROUGH THE STATE BOARD OF MORTICIANS
FRANK G. CORTEZ
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/01/1960Brief on the MeritsPetitioner
03/30/1960Response to Brief filedRespondent
03/28/1960Supplement to Motion for RehearingPetitioner
06/09/1959Reply to ResponsePetitioner
05/25/1959Response to PetitionRespondent
05/25/1959Response to PetitionRespondent
05/08/1959Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/01/1960Brief on the Merits
03/30/1960Response to Brief filed
03/28/1960Supplement to Motion for Rehearing
02/16/1960Response to Motion filed
01/27/1960Opinion issued
07/22/1959Document received (See Remarks)
07/22/1959Document received (See Remarks)
07/22/1959Document received (See Remarks)
06/09/1959Reply to Response
05/25/1959Response to Petition
05/25/1959Response to Petition
05/08/1959Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
05/08/1959Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
State of Texas, Acting by and through the State Board of MorticiansPetitioner
Frank G. CortezRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information