judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-7337
A-7337
05/14/1959
Application for Writ of Error
CHESTER R. MORRIS
ANTHONY P. ROUSOS AND PAUL WHITE, UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS, ANTHONY P. ROUSOS, PAUL WHITE, ARNO NOWOTHY AND CARL BLEDT, TOM E. JOHNSON, ARNO NOWOTNY, CARL BREDT, PAUL WHITE, ANTHONY P. ROUSOS AND TOM E. JOHNSON
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/16/1959Motion for RehearingPetitioner
06/10/1959Reply to ResponsePetitioner
06/02/1959Reply to ResponsePetitioner
05/29/1959Response to PetitionRespondent
05/26/1959Response to PetitionRespondent
05/20/1959Response to PetitionRespondent
05/14/1959Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/07/1959Opinion from the Court of Appeals filed.
11/09/1959Order from Lower Court filed
06/16/1959Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/10/1959Reply to Response
06/02/1959Reply to Response
05/29/1959Response to Petition
05/26/1959Response to Petition
05/20/1959Response to Petition
05/14/1959Affidavit filed
05/14/1959Application for Writ of Error - Filed
05/14/1959Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Anthony P. Rousos and Paul WhiteRespondent
University of Texas, Anthony P. Rousos, Paul White, Arno Nowothy and Carl BledtRespondent
Tom E. JohnsonRespondent
Arno Nowotny, Carl Bredt, Paul White, Anthony P. Rousos and Tom E. JohnsonRespondent
Chester R. MorrisPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information