Case: 05-14-01504-CV
05-14-01504-CV
11/25/2014
Contract
Jeffrey Baron
Gerrit M. Pronske, Individually and Pronske, Goolsby & Kathman, P.C. f/k/a Pronske & Patel, P.C.
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
04/06/2015 | Mandate issued |
| |||||
03/02/2015 | Sent to publisher | | |||||
01/26/2015 | Order entered | Motion or Writ Denied |
| ||||
01/23/2015 | Letter filed |
| |||||
01/22/2015 | Memorandum opinion issued | Remanded |
| ||||
01/22/2015 | Retention time case file will be retained | Destroy | | ||||
01/21/2015 | Submitted | | |||||
01/15/2015 | Motion to dismiss filed |
| |||||
01/14/2015 | Motion to dismiss filed |
| |||||
01/02/2015 | No clerks record filed in civil case |
| |||||
12/26/2014 | Record due | | |||||
12/23/2014 | Motion filed |
| |||||
12/23/2014 | Corrected motion requested |
| |||||
11/25/2014 | Docketing statement filed |
| |||||
11/25/2014 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
| |||||
11/24/2014 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
10/27/2014 | Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court | | |||||
08/28/2014 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/22/2021 | Retention | Date civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate) |
04/06/2015 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Pronske, Goolsby & Kathman, P.C. | Appellee | Jason P. Kathman Melanie P. Goolsby Gerrit M. Pronske |
Pronske, Gerrit M. | Appellee | Gerrit M. Pronske |
Baron, Jeffrey | Appellant | Leonard H. Simon William P. Haddock |
Trial Court Information
193rd Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Carl Ginsberg
DC-14-12042
Stephanie Moses