judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-82-00580-CR
05-82-00580-CR
05/10/1982
Theft
Mills, Joe E.
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/06/2018Order enteredDestroy
05/29/2018Retention time case file will be retainedDestroy
01/22/1987Mandate IssuedAffirmed
12/29/1986Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/17/1983Case Forwarded to Higher CourtMotion or Writ Granted
10/21/1983Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
10/21/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/28/1983Motion for Rehearing Filed
09/16/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/22/1983Submitted
05/24/1983Supplemental Brief Filed
05/04/1983Submission
04/22/1983Brief Filed
03/23/1983Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
03/23/1983Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
02/22/1983Brief Filed
01/27/1983Agreed Record pursuant to TRAP Rule 34.2
01/03/1983Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/27/1982MattConvMotion or Writ Granted
12/27/1982Mot Ext Time File Record DispMotion or Writ Granted
12/09/1982Mot Ext Time File Record DispMotion or Writ Granted
11/19/1982Mot Ext Time File Record DispMotion or Writ Granted
10/21/1982Mot Ext Time File Record DispMotion or Writ Granted
08/25/1982Mot Ext Time File Record DispMotion or Writ Granted
06/29/1982Mot Ext Time File Record DispMotion or Writ Granted
05/10/1982Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/06/2018Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 4
Dallas
f81-10614-IK
16 yrs TDC