Court System: | DISTRICT COURT FOR QUEEN ANNE'S COUNTY (CENTREVILLE) - TRAFFIC SYSTEM |
Citation Number: | 0000000VX0G1JCase Status:CLOSED CASE |
Violation Date: | 03/01/2014 | Violation Time: | 07:24 AM |
Violation County: | QUEEN ANNE'S COUNTY (CENTREVILLE) |
District Code: | 03 | Location Code: | 04 |
AgencyName:BARRACK S (CENTREVILLE) |
Officer Name:BEKKEN, Q.T. |
Officer ID:6031 |
Defendant Information
Defendant Name:MICHAELIDES, ARETULA |
Address:755 ROLLING VIEW DR |
City: | ANNAPOLISState:MDZip Code:21409 |
Race:WHITE,CAUCASIAN,ASIATIC INDIAN,ARAB |
Sex:FHeight:505Weight:140 |
DOB:06/1968 |
Charge: | Article:TASec:21Sub-Sec:801.1Para:Code: |
Description: | EXCEEDING MAXIMUM SPEED: 76 MPH IN A POSTED 55 MPH ZONE |
Speed Limit: | 55 | Recorded Speed: | 076 |
Location Stopped: | EB RT 50 @ CASTLE MARINA |
Contributed to Accident?: | NO | Personal Injury?: | NO |
Vehicle Tag: | HIJINKS | State: | MD | Vehicle Description: | 01TOYT02 |
Disposition Information
Plea: | GUILTY |
Disposition: | PROBATION BEFORE JUDGEMENT |
Disposition Date: | 05/06/2014 |
Speed Limit: | 55 | Convicted Speed: | 076 |
Contributed To Accident: | NO | Personal Injury?: | NO |
Sentence Time: | Yrs:00Mos:00Days:000 |
Suspended Time: | Yrs:00Mos:00Days:000 |
Costs: Fine: | 134.5 | CourtCost: | 25.5 | CICF: | 0 |
Suspended: Fine: | 0 | CourtCost: | 0 | CICF Cost: | 0 |
Event History Information
Event | Date | Comment |
WVTR | 2014-03-11 | WAIVER OF TRIAL - HEARING REQUESTED |
ESCH | 2014-03-27 | 20140506;0130P;02 |
KEYP | 2014-05-06 | TRIAL KEYPOINT 14:22:03 REEL 999999 |
SCHG | 2014-05-06 | D225;A TO T |
SCHG | 2014-05-09 | W201;T TO C |
This is an electronic case record. Full case information cannot be made available either because of legal restrictions on access to case records found in Maryland rules 16-1001 through 16-1011, or because of the practical difficulties inherent in reducing a case record into an electronic format.