judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-82-00319-CR
01-82-00319-CR
05/06/1982
Other Felony
Hicks, Charles Howard
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/25/1985Mandate issued - criminal or civil
01/10/1985Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/03/1984Certificate of Service Filed
11/26/1984Brief filed
11/01/1984Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
10/24/1984Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
10/16/1984Brief filed
09/27/1984Brief filed
08/28/1984Statement of facts filed
08/09/1984Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
07/24/1984Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
06/14/1984Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
06/07/1984Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
05/23/1984Supplemental transcript filed
01/05/1984Order entered
11/10/1983Order entered
10/24/1983Brief due for retained counsel
09/22/1982Transcript filed
04/28/1982Notice of appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/25/1985Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - Appellant
StateCriminal - State of Texas
StateCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
75TH DISTRICT COURT
Callahan
4078
3 years