judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-81-00493-CR
04-81-00493-CR
05/06/1982
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Valenzuela, Antonio
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/14/1983Mandate Issued
11/14/1983Mandate Issued
09/14/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/14/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/15/1983Submission
02/15/1983Submission
02/15/1983Submitted
01/11/1983Letter of Inquiry Filed
09/10/1982Case ready to be set
09/10/1982Brief Filed
09/10/1982Case ready to be set
09/09/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/26/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
08/11/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/06/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
07/14/1982Brief Filed
07/07/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/02/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
06/11/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion Granted in Part
06/02/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
05/06/1982Record Filed
05/05/1982Record Approved
02/11/1982Notice of Appeal Filed
12/28/1981Notice of Appeal Filed
12/28/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/02/2010Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
11/14/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
289th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Tom Rickhoff
80-CR-1508
Twenty-Five (25) years