judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-82-00568-CR
05-82-00568-CR
05/06/1982
Aggravated Assault
Douglas Elbert Richardson
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/05/2017Order enteredDestroy
03/28/2017Retention time case file will be retainedDestroy
11/09/1983Mandate Issued
09/07/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/07/1983Submitted
08/05/1983Submission
05/01/1983MattConv
03/17/1983Transcript Filed
05/06/1982Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/05/2017Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of Texas
Richardson, Douglas ElbertCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
283rd Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Dallas District Judge, 283rd District Court
F81-33075-MT
2 yrs TDC