judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TYRRELL L. EILAND V. SIDNEY RIBEAU, ET AL

Case Information: 10-CV-1020
Short Caption:TYRRELL L. EILAND V. SIDNEY RIBEAU, ET ALClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB625-10Filed Date:08/16/2010

Opening Event Date:08/16/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/07/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/07/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantTyrrell L. Eiland YPro SeN
AppelleeSidney Ribeau N
Marvelle Hall-Mcintyre NN
Marshall W. TaylorNN
AppelleeJames H. Johnson N
Marvelle Hall-Mcintyre NN
Marshall W. TaylorNN
AppelleeHoward UniversityN
Marvelle Hall-Mcintyre NN
Marshall W. TaylorNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/16/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
08/26/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on August 16, 2010, and it appearing that appellant was found eligible for cost-waived status in the trial court, and it further appearing that no transcript is needed forthis appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index and record copies in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (JAC) elp
09/07/2010RECORD INDEX
09/07/2010RECORD COPIES
09/07/2010RECORD COMPLETED
09/17/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellees' brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
11/01/2010 On consideration of this court's order of September 17, 2010, directing appellant to file the brief and the limited appendix, as required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), within 40 days and it appearing that the brief and the limited appendix have not been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that the brief of appellant and the limited appendix shall be submitted within 20 days from the date of this order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice. See D.C. App. R. 13. (JAC) elp
12/01/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF (titled as motion for extension)
12/01/2010RECEIVED - aplt's brief no appendix
12/08/2010APPEARANCE- of Marshall W. Taylor on behalf of aples
12/08/2010APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION-to aplt's motion to extend time to file brief
01/03/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for leave to file the lodged brief, the opposition thereto, and it appearing that the limited appendix was due to be filed with this court on or before December 13, 2010, but the limited appendix has not been filed, see D.C. App. R. 30, 31, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and the Clerk shall file the lodged brief of appellant. It is (MORE)
01/03/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
01/03/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that appellant shall, within 15 days from the date of order, submit the limited appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the appendix or request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice. See D.C. App. R. 13. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the brief of appellee shall be filed within 30 days from the date the appendix is filed with this court. (ETW) elp
02/09/2011 On consideration of this court's order of January 3, 2011, directing appellant to submit the appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time, and it appearing that appellant has failed to comply with the order, it is ORDERED that this appeal is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13. (ETW) elp
02/09/2011DISMISSED
03/07/2011MANDATE ISSUED