judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KLINGENBERG VS. CARLSON

Case Information: 34813
Short Caption:KLINGENBERG VS. CARLSONCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A353801Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/13/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
09/13/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-08579
09/13/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. June 14, 1999 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Rebecca S. Martinelli. 99-08619
09/22/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
12/13/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Appellant has failed to respond in any way to this court's directive to pay the filing fee. We conclude that appellant has abandoned this appeal, and we "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 99-12472
01/10/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-00347
01/10/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/24/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 19, 2000. 00-00347