judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JAMES MICHAEL EVENSON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-07-0163)
Case Number:S-07-0163Case Docketed On:07/19/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:JAMES MICHAEL EVENSON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:JAMES MICHAEL EVENSON, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJames Michael EvensonDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Donna D. Domonkos
Kirk Allan Morgan
AppelleeThe State of WyomingTerry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Bruce A. Salzburg
Cathleen D. Parker

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Prosecutorial Misconduct
Opinion Number:2008 WY 24
Citation:177 P.3d 819

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/19/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/19/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
07/19/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/04/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
09/05/2007Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appellantOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
09/12/2007Brief - Appellant; received copy of brief on disk; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppellantFinal
10/25/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk and designation of record on appealBriefAppelleeFinal
11/08/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
11/13/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
11/14/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Kirk A. Morgan for appellantNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/20/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, three volumes. Volume I, original papers; Volume II, transcripts; Volume III, confidential information.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
11/29/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Cathleen Parker on behalf of appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
12/12/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Kirk Allan Morgan, Assistant Appellate Counsel for appellant; Cathleen D. Parker, Senior Assistant Attorney GeneralEventOral argument presentedFinal
12/12/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
03/05/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Burke writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/21/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
03/21/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
03/21/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
03/21/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
03/25/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 3/23/08 by Candice Ford.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal