judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals

Case: 14-82-00322-CR
14-82-00322-CR
05/07/1982
Other Drug Possession
Gonzales, Anselmo Pina
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/12/1984Mandate Issued
01/12/1984Record RETURNED from Higher Court
11/18/1983Petition for Discretionary ReviewDENIED
08/05/1983Petition for Discretionary Review
07/18/1983Petition for Discretionary Review
06/16/1983Opinion issuedREVERSED AND REMANDED
06/07/1983Motion for Rehearing FILED-ANT,APE,REL,RES,STA
06/02/1983Motion for Rehearing FILED-ANT,APE,REL,RES,STA
05/19/1983Opinion issuedREVERSED AND REMANDED
02/09/1983Submission
11/17/1982AM CUR, OTHER,
10/27/1982AM CUR, OTHER,
07/30/1982Record Filed (Both records FILED)
05/07/1982Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
01/10/1982Case ready to be set
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/12/1984Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
182nd District Court
Harris
345,521
10 yrs.