judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals

Case: 14-82-00297-CV
14-82-00297-CV
05/07/1982
Contract
Tellepsen, Howard T., Et Al
C. Itoh
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/17/1984Mandate Issued
02/29/1984Higher Court DecisionNo Reversible Error
12/02/1983No description available.
11/03/1983Mtn.for Rehearing DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO SE,STAOVERRULED
10/17/1983Ext.time file Mtn.for Rehearing FILED-ANT,APE,APP
10/17/1983Opposition filed
09/13/1983Opposition filed
09/07/1983Motion for Rehearing FILED-ANT,APE,REL,RES,STA
09/07/1983No description available.
08/25/1983Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
08/12/1983Response to Motion FILED-ANT,APE,APP,RES,STA
08/11/1983Memorandum of Authorities
08/02/1983Memorandum of Authorities
06/27/1983No description available.
06/23/1983Mtn.to supplement transcript DISPOSED-ANT,APE,STAGRANTED
06/09/1983Mtn.to supplement transcript FILED-ANT,APE,STA
06/01/1983Response to Reply Brief FILED
04/08/1983Submitted
04/07/1983Submitted
04/07/1983Submitted
03/22/1983AM CUR, OTHER,
03/03/1983No description available.
03/03/1983Submission
02/17/1983No description available.GRANTED
02/17/1983No description available.GRANTED
02/10/1983No description available.
02/04/1983No description available.
02/04/1983No description available.
10/28/1982Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
10/19/1982No description available.
10/13/1982Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
08/02/1982AM CUR, OTHER,
07/06/1982AM CUR, OTHER,
06/03/1982Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
05/18/1982Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
05/07/1982Transcript FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/17/1984Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppellant
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppellee
Trial Court Information
133rd District Court
Harris
79-37966