Case: WR-87,882-01
WR-87,882-01
12/28/2017
11.07 HC
STITES, DAMON JOSHUA
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
05/23/2018 | POSTCARD RETURNED | | |||||
05/22/2018 | NOTICE RETURNED | | |||||
05/09/2018 | ORDER ISSUED | HC relief denied with written order/opinion |
| ||||
03/27/2018 | OBJECTION/FINDINGS |
| |||||
03/26/2018 | SUPP RECD |
| |||||
01/29/2018 | SUPP/CLERK RECORD |
| |||||
01/24/2018 | ORDER ISSUED | HC remanded TC - evidentiary hearing or affidavits |
| ||||
12/28/2017 | WRIT RECEIVED |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
05/09/2018 | STORED | WRIT STORED |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
STITES, DAMON JOSHUA | Applicant | Georgina Stephenson |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information
239th District Court
Brazoria
68984-A