judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-82-00363-CR
01-82-00363-CR
05/10/1982
Other Felony
Smith, Creighton Eugene
State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/09/1985Mandate issued - criminal or civil
07/09/1985Mandate issued - criminal or civil
07/05/1985Case file returned from higher Court or agency.
06/28/1985Mandate issued - criminal or civil
06/12/1985Higher court decisionDismissed
01/30/1984Supplemental transcript filed
08/31/1983No description available.
08/04/1983Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
06/01/1983Motion for rehearing filed
05/19/1983Opinion issuedReversed
05/19/1983Opinion issuedReversed
05/18/1983Submission
05/18/1983Submitted
04/14/1983Brief filed
04/14/1983Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
04/07/1983Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
10/04/1982Brief filed
08/26/1982Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
08/17/1982Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
08/12/1982Record filed
05/10/1982Notice of appeal filed
05/10/1982Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/09/1985Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - State of Texas
StateCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information