Case Information: 90-CF-0901 | |||
Short Caption: | DONALD CARR, JR. V. UNITED STATES | Classification: | Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony |
Lead: | 90-CF-0696 | Consolidated: | 90-CF-0901 |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | F2828-84 | Filed Date: | 06/25/1990 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 06/25/1990 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 08/30/1990 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 08/28/1991 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 11/05/1991 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 12/13/1991 |
Party Information | ||||||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | |||||||
Appellant | Donald Carr, Jr. | N |
| |||||||||
Appellee | United States | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | CARR JR., DONALD UNITED STATES | |||
01/01/1903 | NOTE - 01 CODEF: ANTHONY L. CARR & NOTE - 01 WILLIAM L. THOMAS NOTE - 02 CON 90-696 NOTE - 02 NOTE - 03 4/26/91 ORD: BRF OF APLT DUE NOTE - 03 BY 6/13/91, BRF OF APLE DUE BY NOTE - 04 7/18/91 & REPLY BRF OF APLT, NOTE - 04 IF ANY, DUE BY 8/6/91; SCHED NOTE - 05 CASE ON OCTOBER CAL; NFX. NOTE - 05 NOTE - 06 7/10/91 ORD: GRANT MO OF APLT NOTE - 06 FOR LV TO W/D APLT'S BRF & FL NOTE - 07 A SUBSTITUTED BRF & BRF IS DUE NOTE - 07 BY 7/24/91; BRF OF APLE DUE BY NOTE - 08 8/28/91 & REPLY BRF OF APLT, NOTE - 08 IF ANY, DUE BY 9/16/91; SCHED NOTE - 09 CASE ON NOV. 1991 CAL; NFX. NOTE - 09 | |||
01/01/1905 | TRDATE- 91/11/05 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - HOFFMANM FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - SIMONA FOR - APPELLEE | |||
06/25/1990 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
07/20/1990 | APPELLANT'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE 90-696 WITH THIS APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
08/13/1990 | ORDER GRNT MO OF APLT TO CONS 90-696 & 90-901; APLT TO FL DSA IN 10 DAYS. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 072090 SCHPRD TO | |||
08/23/1990 | APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
08/28/1990 | APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) MICHAEL H. HOFFMAN, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
08/28/1990 | ORDER SS, APPT MICHAEL HOFFMAN FOR APLT. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
08/30/1990 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
08/30/1990 | RECORD ON APPEAL AJ PANEL SCDATE 082490 SCHPRD R | |||
12/31/1990 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(37 PGS/BURNS) AD PANEL SCDATE 020891 SCHPRD RT | |||
03/15/1991 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (5 PGS.-- MOORE) PR PANEL SCDATE 020791 SCHPRD RT | |||
03/22/1991 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (12-PGS/MOORE) AJ PANEL SCDATE 020991 SCHPRD RT | |||
04/26/1991 | ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 03-05. DAS PANELJAC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
06/13/1991 | APPELLANT'S BRIEF **BRIEF WITHDRAWN**, SEE 7/10 ORDER. PMB PANEL SCDATE 061391 SCHPRD BA | |||
06/14/1991 | MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLT FOR LV TO FL CORRECTIONS TO THE BR THAT WAS SUBMITTED IN THIS CASE AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
06/24/1991 | ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT FOR LV TO FL CORRECTIONS TO BRF; APLE'S BRF STILLE DUE BY 7/18/91. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
07/02/1991 | MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLT TO WITHDRAW BRIEF & SUBSTITUTE BRIEF WITHIN 30 DAYS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
07/10/1991 | ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 06-09. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 042691 SCHPRD CHECK | |||
07/23/1991 | MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLT DIR REMOVAL OF BRIEF PREVIOUSLY FILED & TO ACCEPT SUBSTITUTE BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 072491 SCHPRD BA | |||
07/23/1991 | RECEIVED APPELLANT'S SUBSTITUTE BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
07/30/1991 | ORDER APLT MO W/DRAW PREVIOUS BRF & SUBSTITUTE LODGED BRF GRNTD. SUBSTITUE BRF FLD. GR PANELJWR SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
08/28/1991 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
08/28/1991 | APPELEE'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 082891 SCHPRD BE | |||
10/22/1991 | APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF APPELLANT'S RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
10/22/1991 | RECEIVED APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
11/01/1991 | ORDER GRANT APLT'S MOT FOR LV TO FIL REPLY BRIEF, LODGED REPLY BRF KHO PANELROSTSC SCDATE 110191 SCHPRD O | |||
11/01/1991 | APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF KHO PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
11/04/1991 | CERTIFICATE PER RULE 28 OF APLE AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
11/05/1991 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
11/05/1991 | ARGUED PANELRGSTSC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
11/20/1991 | AFFIRMED MOJ AF DECISION APPEALED FROM PANELRGSTSC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
11/20/1991 | DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE | |||
12/13/1991 | MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD |