judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals

Case: 14-82-00327-CR
14-82-00327-CR
05/10/1982
All Misdemeanors
Galen, Dale Hardin
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/15/1984Mandate Issued
05/11/1984Record RETURNED from Higher Court
04/25/1984Mtn.for Rehearing DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO SE,STAOVERRULED
02/29/1984Petition for Discretionary ReviewDENIED
11/16/1983Petition for Discretionary Review
11/07/1983Petition for Discretionary Review
09/22/1983Opinion issuedREVERSED AND REMANDED
09/07/1983Submission
06/13/1983Case ready to be set
05/12/1983Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
05/03/1983AM CUR, OTHER,
11/29/1982AM CUR, OTHER,
11/18/1982Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
10/14/1982Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
09/16/1982Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
08/25/1982Record Filed (Both records FILED)
05/10/1982Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/15/1984Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - Appellant
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
Co Crim Ct at Law No 5
Harris
641,390
$500 fine