Case: 13-0894
13-0894
11/07/2013
Petition for Review originally filed as 53.7(f)
SHAFAII CHILDREN'S TRUST AND PARTY AND RECEPTION CENTER, INC.
WEST AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY, LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, AND AMERICA FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
12/06/2013 | Petition for Review | Petitioner | Petition for Review filed on behalf of Shafaii Children’s Trust, et al. (HARD COPIES REC'D) |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/14/2014 | Case Stored | Row 11 A-2 | | |||||
03/13/2014 | Notice sent to Court of Appeals | |
| |||||
01/31/2014 | Petition for Review disposed | Denied | |
| ||||
12/31/2013 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |||||
12/18/2013 | Response Waiver filed | Response Waiver filed on behalf of West American Insurance Co., et al. | ||||||
12/06/2013 | Petition for Review | Petition for Review filed on behalf of Shafaii Children’s Trust, et al. (HARD COPIES REC'D) |
| |||||
11/07/2013 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposed | Filing granted | Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review is Granted. Petition for Review is due December 6, 2013. |
| ||||
11/07/2013 | Call received | Mr. Gibson's assistant, Linda, called back to inform the Court that they wished to request an additional 14 days from the November 22, 2013, due date. | | |||||
11/07/2013 | Phone call from Clerk's Office | Spoke with Mr. Gibson's assistant, Linda, and informed them that the due date for petition for review was November 22, 2013. Asked if they wished to disregard the filed motion or did they want to request an additional 14 days form the November 22nd due date. | | |||||
11/07/2013 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed | Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Shafaii Children's Trust, et al. |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
03/14/2014 | Case Stored | Case stored. | Row 11 A-2 |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
West American Insurance Company | Respondent | Mr. David L. Plaut Ms. Catherine L. Hanna |
Shafaii Children's Trust | Petitioner | Mr. Seth Adam Miller Mr. George R. Gibson |
Court of Appeals Information:
14-12-00447-CV
Affirmed
417 SW3d 614, 10-08-13
14th Court of Appeals
Honorable Tracy K. Christopher
Trial Court Information
295th District Court
Harris
Honorable Caroline E. Baker
2010-45389