judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-82-00398-CR
04-82-00398-CR
05/10/1982
Burglary
Riles, Marcus Wayne
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/20/1983Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals
06/20/1983Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsMotion or Writ No Action Taken
10/08/1982Brief Filed
10/08/1982Case ready to be set
09/20/1982Brief Filed
08/20/1982Record Approved
08/04/1982Exhibits Filed
08/02/1982No Description Available.
07/09/1982Record Filed
07/06/1982Record Filed
07/06/1982Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
05/10/1982Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/20/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
187th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Pat Priest
82CR0618
20 years