judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TAMMY PRICE V. RONALD GORHAM

Case Information: 10-CV-1019
Short Caption:TAMMY PRICE V. RONALD GORHAMClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB5848-10Filed Date:08/12/2010

Opening Event Date:08/12/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/01/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/05/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantTammy Price YPro SeN
AppelleeRonald Gorham YPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/12/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
08/26/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on August 12, 2010, and it appearing that appellant was granted in forma pauperis status in the trial court, and it further appearing that transcript may be needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that appellant shall within 10 calendar days from the date of this order, file with the Court Reporting Division a motion for preparation of transcripts of proceedings in the Superior Court, with notice to appellee(s), for determination in accordance with Hancock v. Mutual of Omaha Ins. Co., 472 A.2d 867 (D.C. 1984). See D.C. App. R. 10(b)(5)(A). The Court Reporting Division will submit the motion to the appropriate judge for a decision as to whether transcripts will be provided at no cost. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant shall simultaneously submit a file-stamped copy of that motion with this court. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC) elp
09/08/2010RECEIVED - motion for appeal transcript (RT-NEEDED/RT-ORDERED for 8/12/10) (elp)
10/01/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (12-pgs/tape 8/12/10 proc.)w/cd attached
10/01/2010RECORD COMPLETED
10/06/2010RECORD INDEX
10/06/2010RECORD COPIES
10/07/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
11/18/2010 On consideration of this court's order of October 7, 2010, directing appellant to file the brief and the limited appendix, as required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), within 40 days and it appearing that the brief and the limited appendix have not been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that the brief of appellant and the limited appendix shall be submitted within 20 days from the date of this order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice. See D.C. App. R. 13. (JAC) elp
12/13/2010 On consideration of this court's order of November 18, 2010, directing appellant to submit the brief and the limited appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time, and it apeparing that appellant has failed to comply with ther order, it is ORDERED that this appeal is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13. (ETW) elp
12/13/2010DISMISSED
01/05/2011ERROR-REUSE
01/05/2011MANDATE ISSUED