judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CC BUILDERS, INC., a Wyoming corporation v. WAYNE GARRISON and PAMELA GARRISON

Case Heading (S-07-0162)
Case Number:S-07-0162Case Docketed On:07/18/2007
Linked To: S-07-0132 , S-07-0133
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Code of Civil Procedure (Title 1)
Short Title:CC BUILDERS, INC., a Wyoming corporation v. WAYNE GARRISON and PAMELA GARRISON
Full Title:CC BUILDERS, INC., a Wyoming corporation, Appellant (Defendant), v. WAYNE GARRISON and PAMELA GARRISON, Appellees (Plaintiffs).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantCC BuildersKenneth S. Cohen
AppelleeWayne GarrisonLawrence B. Hartnett
AppelleePamela GarrisonLawrence B. Hartnett

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2008 WY 34
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/18/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/18/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
07/18/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
07/18/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/04/2007Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
10/19/2007Brief - AppelleesBriefAppelleeFinal
11/08/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
11/14/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
11/26/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Kenneth S. Cohen for CC Builders Inc.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
12/04/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, eight volumes (two boxes total). Volumes I-V, original papers; Volume VI, exhibits; Volume VII, attachments to pleadings; Volume VIII, (one box containing) transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
12/12/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Lawrence B. Hartnett for appellants Garrison and Kenneth S. Cohen for appellees CC Builders, Inc. and Clint Cook) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
12/12/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
03/28/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part and reversing in part and remanding. Chief Justice Voigt writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/15/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/15/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
04/15/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/15/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
04/21/2008Service - Certified mail signature return cards. Record signed for 4/17/08 by E. Johnson (2 cards, 2 boxes)ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal