judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HOEFT-ROSS VS. BUMPUS

Case Information: 34812
Short Caption:HOEFT-ROSS VS. BUMPUSCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 34375
Lower Court Case(s):Lyon Co. - Third Judicial District - CI13292Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:YoungCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/10/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/10/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-08571
09/17/1999OtherDisqualification of Justice Young. Law firm of Heaton & Doescher.
11/03/1999MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss. 99-10744
11/03/1999MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 99-10756
01/06/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. This is a proper person appeal. Respondent filed a motion to dismiss the appeal. The motion to dismiss is granted, and we "ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn1[Although appellants were not granted leave to file papers in proper person, we have considered the proper person documents received from appellants]. NNP99B-RR/DA/ML 00-00204
02/01/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-01587
02/01/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/11/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 3, 2000. 00-01587