Case: 13-0815
13-0815
10/10/2013
Petition for Review/Cause under Tex. R. App. P. 59.1
BILLY EDWARD DAMUTH, II
TRINITY VALLEY COMMUNITY COLLEGE AND GLENDON S. FORGEY, INDIVIDUALLY
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
04/04/2014 | Brief on the Merits | Respondent | Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Trinity Valley Community College. | |||||
03/17/2014 | Brief on the Merits | Petitioner | Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Billy Edward Damuth, II. | |||||
12/19/2013 | Response to Petition | Respondent | Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Trinity Valley Community College, et al. (HARD COPIES REC'D) | |||||
10/10/2013 | Petition for Review | Petitioner | Petition for Review filed on behalf of Billy Edward Damuth, II. (HARD COPIES REC'D) |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
01/23/2015 | Case Stored | G02 Row 14 D-5 | | |||||||
01/16/2015 | Mandate issued | Mandate & Cost Bill Issued |
| |||||||
11/21/2014 | Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of record | Issued | | |||||||
11/21/2014 | Opinion issued | Court of Appeals' judgment reversed; cause remanded to trial court | Pursuant to Texas Rule of Appellate Procedure 59.1, after granting the petition for review and without hearing oral argument, the Court reverses the court of appeals' judgment and remands the case to the trial court. (11/21/2014 12:46:28 PM) 13-0815.jmt.pdf, 130815.pdf |
| ||||||
11/21/2014 | Petition for Review disposed | Petition granted pursuant to TRAP 59.1 | | | ||||||
11/21/2014 | Petition for Review granted under TRAP 59.1 | | | |||||||
04/04/2014 | Brief on the Merits | Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Trinity Valley Community College. | ||||||||
03/17/2014 | Brief on the Merits | Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Billy Edward Damuth, II. | ||||||||
02/14/2014 | Case Record Filed | Electronic Appellate Record received. | | |||||||
02/14/2014 | Record Requested in Petition for Review | Record requested from the 12th COA | | |||||||
02/14/2014 | Brief on the Merits Requested | Petitioner brief due 03/17/14. Response brief due 04/07/14. Reply brief due 04/22/14. |
| |||||||
12/19/2013 | Response to Petition | Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Trinity Valley Community College, et al. (HARD COPIES REC'D) | ||||||||
11/22/2013 | Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response | Requested response to petition for review due no later than December 23, 2013. |
| |||||||
10/22/2013 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |||||||
10/16/2013 | Response Waiver filed | Waiver of Response filed on behalf of Trinity Valley Community College, et al. | ||||||||
10/10/2013 | Petition for Review | Petition for Review filed on behalf of Billy Edward Damuth, II. (HARD COPIES REC'D) |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
01/23/2015 | Case Stored | Case stored. | G02 Row 14 D-5 |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Damuth, II, Billy Edward | Petitioner | Ms. Victoria Ray 'Tory' Thatcher Mr. Richard L. Ray |
Trinity Valley Community College | Respondent | Ms. Leigh Campbell Porter |
Court of Appeals Information:
12-12-00353-CV
Affirmed
446 SW3d 401, 07-31-13
12th Court of Appeals
Honorable Sam Griffith
Trial Court Information
392nd District Court
Henderson
Honorable Carter William Tarrance
2012B-0207