judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Power Reps, Inc., Bob Bergin and Jeff Jacquin v. Cy Cates, Power Reps Industrial, LLC, and Global Transformer Specialists, Inc.

Case: 01-13-00856-CV
01-13-00856-CV
10/09/2013
Contract
Power Reps, Inc., Bob Bergin and Jeff Jacquin
Cy Cates, Power Reps Industrial, LLC, and Global Transformer Specialists, Inc.
No
www.txcourts.gov/1stcoa
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Document
07/24/2014Reply brief filedAppellant
07/14/2014Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
07/11/2014Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
06/13/2014Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
05/14/2014Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Document
11/06/2015Mandate issued
08/28/2015Motion for rehearing disposedMotion or Writ Denied
08/28/2015Order entered
08/28/2015Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing disposedMotion or Writ Denied
08/26/2015Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing filed
08/26/2015Motion for rehearing due
08/24/2015Motion for rehearing filed
08/11/2015Memorandum opinion issuedAffirm TC judgment in part, reverse TC judgment in part, and remand case to TC for further proceedings
08/11/2015Judgment Issued
01/27/2015Submitted
12/08/2014Letter issued by the court
11/10/2014Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied
08/25/2014Reply brief due
08/06/2014Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/05/2014Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed
08/04/2014Reply brief due
07/24/2014Reply brief filed
07/14/2014Brief filed - oral argument requested
07/14/2014Case ready to be set
07/14/2014Appellees brief due
07/14/2014Appellants brief due
07/11/2014Brief filed - oral argument requested
06/24/2014Motion to exceed brief length disposedGrant motion in part and deny motion in part
06/24/2014Order enteredGrant motion in part and deny motion in part
06/19/2014Motion to exceed brief length filed
06/13/2014Brief filed - oral argument requested
06/13/2014Appellees brief due
06/13/2014Appellants brief due
06/11/2014Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/10/2014Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
05/28/2014Docketing statement filed
05/14/2014Docketing statement filed
05/14/2014Brief filed - oral argument requested
05/14/2014Appellants brief due
05/13/2014Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/09/2014Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
05/02/2014Letter filed
04/14/2014Reporters record filed
04/14/2014Reporters record filed
03/13/2014Reporters record due
03/13/2014Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/12/2014Extension of time to file reporters record filed
03/12/2014Reporters record due
02/27/2014Letter filed
02/13/2014Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/12/2014Extension of time to file reporters record filed
02/12/2014Record due
11/15/2013Clerks record filed
10/29/2013Court fee due
10/29/2013Docketing statement due
10/21/2013Notice filed
10/21/2013Amended notice of appeal filed
10/18/2013Notice of appeal filed in trial court
10/15/2013Judgment signed by trial court judge
10/09/2013Case began in court of appeals
10/09/2013Notice of appeal received
10/07/2013Notice of appeal filed in trial court
08/14/2013Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/06/2015Case StoredCase stored
11/06/2021RetentionDate civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Cy Cates, Power Reps Industrial, LLC, and Global Transformer Specialists, Inc.AppelleeMary Elizabeth Duff
Amy L. Mitchell
Power Reps, Inc., Bob Bergin and Jeff Jacquin AppellantRaymond H. Stauffacher Jr.
Trial Court Information
400th District Court
Fort Bend
Honorable Judge 400th District Court
10-DCV-183723
Karen Rothman