judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-5309
B-5309
05/15/1975
Application for Writ of Error
JOHN E. MITCHELL COMPANY
ROBERT V. ANDERSON AND BARBARA BENZEL ANDERSON, REPUBLIC SMALL BUSINESS INVESTMENT CORPORATION AND REPUBLIC NATIONAL BANK OF DALLAS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
08/01/1975Motion for RehearingPetitioner
07/14/1975Reply to ResponsePetitioner
05/30/1975Response to PetitionRespondent
05/15/1975Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
08/07/1975Response to Motion filed
08/01/1975Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/14/1975Reply to Response
06/09/1975Miscellaneous Motion
05/30/1975Response to Petition
05/16/1975Letter Filed
05/15/1975Application for Writ of Error - Filed
05/15/1975Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Republic Small Business Investment Corporation and Republic National Bank of DallasRespondent
Robert V. Anderson and Barbara Benzel AndersonRespondent
John E. Mitchell CompanyPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information