Case: 13-15-00534-CR
13-15-00534-CR
11/12/2015
Miscellaneous/Other Criminal including Misdemeanor or Felony
The State of Texas
Christopher Ray Maldonado
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
02/17/2016 | Reply brief filed | Appellant |
| ||||||
02/16/2016 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellee |
| ||||||
02/15/2016 | Brief received - oral argument not requested | Appellee |
| ||||||
01/19/2016 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellant |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
07/05/2016 | Mandate acknowledged by trial court clerk | | |||||||
07/01/2016 | Mandate issued |
| |||||||
03/24/2016 | Memorandum opinion issued | Reversed and Remanded |
| ||||||
03/23/2016 | Submitted | | |||||||
03/02/2016 | Set for submission on briefs |
| |||||||
02/19/2016 | Certificate of service filed | | |||||||
02/17/2016 | Reply brief filed |
| |||||||
02/16/2016 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested |
| |||||||
02/15/2016 | Brief received - oral argument not requested |
| |||||||
01/19/2016 | Case ready to be set | | |||||||
01/19/2016 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested |
| |||||||
01/11/2016 | Reporters record filed |
| |||||||
12/15/2015 | Clerks record filed |
| |||||||
11/17/2015 | Docketing statement filed | | |||||||
11/12/2015 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
| |||||||
11/10/2015 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||||
11/09/2015 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
07/01/2041 | Retention | Date criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate) |
07/05/2016 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Maldonado , Christopher Ray | Appellee | Hon. Edward P. Wilkinson |
The State Of Texas | Criminal - Appellant | Hon. Stephen B. Tyler Hon. Brendan W. Guy |
Trial Court Information
24th District Court
Victoria
Honorable Jack W. Marr
15-10-28976-A
Marnie Gabrysch