judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-5297
B-5297
05/12/1975
Application for Writ of Error
MRS. SEB S. WILCOX, ET AL.
ST. MARYS UNIVERSITY OF SAN ANTONIO, INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/07/1976Brief in Support of PetitionAmicus Curiae
12/26/1975Motion for RehearingRespondent
05/23/1975Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/16/1975Response to PetitionRespondent
05/12/1975Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/30/1979Motion to Withdraw FiledFiling granted
12/17/1976Opinion issued
01/07/1976Brief in Support of Petition
12/26/1975Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/16/1975Document received (See Remarks)
07/16/1975Document received (See Remarks)
05/23/1975Amicus Curiae Brief received
05/16/1975Response to Petition
05/12/1975Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
05/12/1975Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
St. Marys University of San Antonio, Inc.Respondent
State of Texas and the City of LaredoAmicus Curiae
Mrs. Seb S. Wilcox, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information