judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

N. G. BUCHOZ v. WILLIAM KLEIN, JOHN KLEIN AND JOSEPH SONNENBERG

Case: A-294
A-294
07/31/1944
Application for Writ of Error
N. G. BUCHOZ
WILLIAM KLEIN, JOHN KLEIN AND JOSEPH SONNENBERG
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
08/05/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
07/31/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
01/31/1945Motion to Withdraw FiledFiling granted
01/08/1945Letter Filed
11/01/1944Bond
10/25/1944Document received (See Remarks)
08/05/1944Response to Petition
07/31/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
07/31/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
William Klein, John Klein and Joseph SonnenbergRespondent
N. G. BuchozPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information