judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STATE VS. DISTRICT COURT

Case Information: 38165
Short Caption:STATE VS. DISTRICT COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 38296
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C172746Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/16/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/16/2001Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Prohibition. 01-11948
07/16/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Procedural Deficiency. Proof of service on the respondent district judge. Due Date: 10 days
07/18/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. The real party in interest, on behalf of respondents, shall have 20 days from the date of this order within which to file an answer, including authorities, against issuance of the requested writ. 01-12179
07/24/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. on the respondent district judge Bonaventure. 01-12511
08/07/2001MotionFiled Stipulation. (Extension of time to file answer.) 01-13289
08/08/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Approving Stipulation. filed August 7, 2001, the parties filed a stipulation for an extension of time to file the answer to the writ petition. The stipulation is approved. The real party in interest shall have to and including August 10, 2001, to file and serve the answer. 01-13437
08/10/2001Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. 01-13584
09/12/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. Denying Petition for a Writ of Prohibition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." NNP02-MS/RR/NB 01-15370
10/09/2001RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 01-15605
10/09/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.