judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

IN RE: ESTATE OF BETTY PAYNE; MARCUS S. PAYNE, APLT

Case Information: 10-PR-1059
Short Caption:IN RE: ESTATE OF BETTY PAYNE; MARCUS S. PAYNE, APLTClassification:Appeals - Probate - Probate
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:ADM929-06Filed Date:08/20/2010

Opening Event Date:08/20/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/09/2010

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMarcus S. Payne NPro SeN
AppelleeEstate of Betty PayneNPro SeN
AppelleeAdalynn C. Payne NPro SeN
AppelleeEric C. Payne N
AppelleeFirst Horizon N
David H. CoxNY
Lydia AuzouxNN
AppelleeNavy Federal Credit UnionN
Amy S. OwensNN
Ben Selan NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/20/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
09/02/2010 ORDERED that appellant shall, W/N 20 DAYS from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for having been taken from a NON-APPEALABLE ORDER. See DeFoe v. Nat Capital Bank, 90 A.2d 242, 243 (DC 1952). (BY: ETW)
09/02/2010TMC - OTSC
10/18/2010 ORDERED that this appeal is HEREBY DISMISSED as having been taken from a NON-APPEALABLE ORDER... (RDBETE) (jl)
10/18/2010DISMISSED
11/09/2010MANDATE ISSUED
04/17/2014FiledArchived