Case: PD-1531-92
PD-1531-92
11/17/1992
PDR Case Type
BREWER, JESSE RAY
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
12/03/1992 | RESPONSE FILED | State | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
01/08/1993 | FINAL DISP | Refused | |
12/23/1992 | PDR DISP | Refused | |
12/23/1992 | PDR DISP | Refused | |
12/03/1992 | RESPONSE FILED | | |
11/17/1992 | PDR FILED | | |
11/17/1992 | PDR FILED | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/15/1993 | STORED | RETURNED COA |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
BREWER, JESSE RAY | Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases) | Karen Zellars |
STATE OF TEXAS | State | John B. Holmes |
Court of Appeals Information:
08-91-00123-CR
AFF 9-30-92
8th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
177th District Court
Harris
Honorable Curt F. Steib
524292