judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MITCHELL (PAUL) VS. WARDEN

Case Information: 34611
Short Caption:MITCHELL (PAUL) VS. WARDENCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):White Pine Co. - Seventh Judicial District - HC9809021Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/16/2000How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/03/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/03/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-07091
10/07/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 34590, 34611. 99-09639
03/09/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 30 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 34590, 34611. 00-03723
03/16/2000Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Mailed on 03/14/00. 00-04194
03/16/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
06/18/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. 'ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED.' fn16[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in these matters, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] SNP01A-CY/ML/NB 01-10127
08/07/2001Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." fn2[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] SNP01A-CY/ML/NB 01-13352
08/23/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-13439
08/23/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/11/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 5, 2001. 01-13439