judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KEITH JORDAN BOOTH v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-07-0004)
Case Number:S-07-0004Case Docketed On:01/04/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:KEITH JORDAN BOOTH v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:KEITH JORDAN BOOTH, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantKeith Jordan BoothDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Donna D. Domonkos
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Sentencing, Other
Opinion Number:2007 WY 3
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/04/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/04/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/04/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/20/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
02/21/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
04/06/2007Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
04/06/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
05/23/2007Brief - Appellant; received copy of brief on disk; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppellantFinal
07/02/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk and designation of record on appealBriefAppelleeFinal
07/09/2007Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
07/09/2007Notice-Internal - Veto of expedited docket recommendation.Notice-InternalVetoFinal
07/20/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/20/2007Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
07/25/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Confidential FileRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/25/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
08/14/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
08/22/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Donna Domonkos for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/31/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from counsel for appelleeNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/04/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - D. Michael Pauling for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/18/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Donna D. Domonkos, Senior Assistant Appellate Counsel for appellant; D. Michael Pauling, Senior Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
09/18/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
12/04/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal - supplement requested by CourtNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
12/06/2007Record - Supplemental record on appeal, exhibitsRecordSupplemental record on appealFinal
12/06/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filed - SupplementalNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
01/10/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Hill writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
01/28/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
01/28/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
01/28/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
01/28/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/30/2008Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal