judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

PERRY, MILDRED J. PFB

Case Information: 80-AA-1381
Short Caption:PERRY, MILDRED J. PFBClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Police/Fire Retire/Relief Bd.
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:12/11/1980

Opening Event Date:12/11/1980Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:12/30/1980Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/21/1981
Argued/Submitted:02/09/1982
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901PERRY, MILDRED J. PFB
12/11/1980FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
12/30/1980FiledRecord Completed
10/21/1981FiledBriefing Completed
02/09/1982FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
08/09/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition