Case: 11-17-00321-CR
11-17-00321-CR
11/21/2017
Injury to a Child, Elderly or Disabled Individual
Meghan Rebecca Wilson
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
06/08/2018 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | State |
| ||
05/09/2018 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellant |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
02/21/2020 | Case stored | | |||||||
02/21/2020 | Mandate issued |
| |||||||
12/30/2019 | Certification of Compliance that opinion sent to criminal defendant |
| |||||||
12/12/2019 | Memorandum opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||||||
10/10/2019 | Submitted | | |||||||
09/19/2019 | Set for submission on briefs |
| |||||||
06/08/2018 | Case ready to be set | | |||||||
06/08/2018 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested |
| |||||||
05/09/2018 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested |
| |||||||
04/12/2018 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||||
04/06/2018 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||||
03/15/2018 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||||
03/08/2018 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||||
02/08/2018 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||||
02/05/2018 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||||
01/30/2018 | Notice of late brief |
| |||||||
12/27/2017 | Reporters record filed |
| |||||||
12/21/2017 | Clerks record filed |
| |||||||
12/06/2017 | Docketing statement filed |
| |||||||
12/01/2017 | Notice of late docketing statement |
| |||||||
11/21/2017 | Case Information Sheet from trial court clerk filed |
| |||||||
11/21/2017 | Case began in court of appeals | | |||||||
11/20/2017 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||||
10/26/2017 | Trial court certification filed | | |||||||
10/26/2017 | Sentence imposed in the trial court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
02/21/2020 | Case Stored | Case stored |
02/21/2020 | Retention | Criminal case to be retained permanently (sentence over 20 years or historical value) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Wilson, Meghan Rebecca | Criminal - Appellant | Amos W. (Trey) Keith III |
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Benjamin R. Smith, District Attorney |
Trial Court Information
132nd District Court
Scurry
Honorable Ernie Armstrong, Judge
10491
Terry Hanshew, Court Reporter
25 years