judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-5337
B-5337
05/29/1975
Application for Writ of Error
HARRY PORTWOOD, DANNIE PORTWOOD FANCHER, SAM PORTWOOD
JO ANN PORTWOOD BUCKALEW, GUARDIAN AND ATTORNEY-IN-FACT FOR HARLEY PORTWOOD, LINDA JO PORTWOOD AND BILLY SUNDAY PORTWOOD, JR.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/17/1975Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
08/07/1975Motion for RehearingPetitioner
08/07/1975Motion for RehearingPetitioner
08/06/1975Motion for RehearingPetitioner
06/13/1975Response to PetitionRespondent
05/29/1975Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
05/29/1975Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
05/29/1975Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/17/1975Brief in Support of Petition
08/07/1975Motion for RehearingOverruled
08/07/1975Motion for RehearingOverruled
08/06/1975Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/13/1975Response to Petition
06/03/1975Conditional application for writ of error filed
05/29/1975Application for Writ of Error - Filed
05/29/1975Application for Writ of Error - Filed
05/29/1975Document received (See Remarks)
05/29/1975Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Sam PortwoodPetitioner
Dannie Portwood FancherPetitioner
Harry PortwoodPetitioner
Jo Ann Portwood Buckalew, Guardian and Attorney-In-Fact for Harley Portwood, Linda Jo Portwood and Billy Sunday Portwood, Jr.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information