judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-293
A-293
07/31/1944
Application for Writ of Error
DICK WILLIAMS, ET AL., STATE OF TEXAS
GREAT SOUTHERN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, ASA A. JONES, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/17/1944Motion for RehearingPetitioner
08/23/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
08/22/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
07/31/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
07/31/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/17/1944Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/04/1944Order from Lower Court filed
08/23/1944Response to Petition
08/22/1944Response to Petition
07/31/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledRefused
07/31/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledRefused
07/31/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
ASA A. Jones, et al.Respondent
Dick Williams, et al.Petitioner
State of TexasPetitioner
Great Southern Life Insurance CompanyRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information