Case Heading (S-07-0183) | |||||
Case Number: | S-07-0183 | Case Docketed On: | 08/13/2007 | ||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | Eighth Judicial District Converse County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Civil - Public Lands (Title 36) | ||
Short Title: | WYOMING BOARD OF LAND COMMISSIONERS v. ANTELOPE COAL COMPANY, a Wyoming Corporation | ||||
Full Title: | WYOMING BOARD OF LAND COMMISSIONERS, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. ANTELOPE COAL COMPANY, a Wyoming Corporation, Appellee (Defendant). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | Board of Land Commissioners | Michael L. Hubbard Susan Kay Stipe Martin L. Hardsocg Bruce A. Salzburg Brandi Lee Monger |
Appellee | Antelope Coal Company | Patrick Reed Day Hadassah Marie Reimer |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | Natural Resources - Mining and Minerals |
Opinion Number: | 2008 WY 60 |
Citation: | 185 P.3d 666 |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
08/13/2007 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
08/13/2007 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
08/13/2007 | Fees - Docket fee received | Fees | Docket fee received | Final | |
08/13/2007 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
09/27/2007 | Brief - Appellant; received copy of brief on disk and designation of record on appeal | Brief | Appellant | Final | |
11/09/2007 | Brief - Appellee; and received copy on disk. | Brief | Appellee | Final | |
11/13/2007 | Notice-Incoming - Designation of record - appellee | Notice-Incoming | Designation of record | Final | |
11/26/2007 | Brief - Appellant reply | Brief | Appellant reply | Final | |
11/28/2007 | Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal | Notice-Outgoing | Request for transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
12/05/2007 | Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, four volumes. Volumes I - III, Original Papers; Volumes IV, Transcript | Record | Transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
12/05/2007 | Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filed | Notice-Outgoing | Transmitted record on appeal filed | Final | |
12/07/2007 | Order - Oral argument scheduled | Order | Oral argument scheduled | Final | |
12/19/2007 | Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Brandi Monger for appellee. | Notice-Incoming | Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting | Final | |
12/26/2007 | Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Patrick Day for appellee. | Notice-Incoming | Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting | Final | |
01/16/2008 | Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Brandi Lee Monger, Assistant Attorney General for appellant; Patrick Reed Day for appellee) and taken under advisement. | Event | Oral argument presented | Final | |
01/16/2008 | Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice | Notice-Internal | Oral argument notice | Final | |
06/03/2008 | Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Burke writing for the Court | Opinion | Opinion and journal order | Final | |
06/19/2008 | Notice-Outgoing - Mandate | Notice-Outgoing | Mandate | Final | |
06/19/2008 | Notice-Outgoing - Record return letter | Notice-Outgoing | Record return letter | Final | |
06/19/2008 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final |