judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

HENRY OFUMBI V. RANDSTAD INHOUSE SERVICES, LP

Case Information: 10-AA-1054
Short Caption:HENRY OFUMBI V. RANDSTAD INHOUSE SERVICES, LPClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DOES01322-10Filed Date:08/25/2010

Opening Event Date:08/25/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:01/04/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/18/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerHenry Ofumbi NPro SeN
RespondentRandstad Inhouse Services LpNPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/25/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW
08/25/2010FILING FEE of $100.00.
08/25/2010CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD, OAH and Todd Kim, Esq.
09/08/2010 On consideration of the petition for review in this matter, and it appearing that Randstad Inhouse Services is a business that must be represented by counsel, it is ORDERED that respondent shall within 30 days from the date of this order advise this court as to the identity of its counsel. See Moore Energy Resources, Inc. v. Public Serv. Comm'n of the District of Columbia, 785 A.2d 300, 304 9D.C. 2001); D.C. APP. R. 15 (A)(5). It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Office of the Administrative Hearings shall file the record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). For the Court, Julio A. Castillo, Clerk.
10/15/2010 On consideration of this court's order of September 8, 2010, directing respondent to identify its counsel within 30 days from the date of the order, and it appearing that respondent has failed to comply with the order, it is ORDERED that respondent shall within 15 days from the date of this order advise this court as to the identity of its counsel. See Moore Energy Resources, Inc. v. Public Serv. Comm'n of the District of Columbia, 785 A.2d 300, 304 (D.C. 2001); D.C. App. R. 15 (a)(5). Failure to comply with this order shall result in respondent being prohibited from filing its brief. (JAC)
01/04/2011RECORD ON APPEAL w/7/20/10 hearing
01/04/2011RECORD COMPLETED
01/06/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that petitioner's brief and the appendix shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and respondent's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 30, 31. (JAC)
02/11/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL
02/24/2011ORDER GRANT PTNR MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL
02/24/2011DISMISSED
03/18/2011MANDATE ISSUED