Case: 05-11-01337-CV
05-11-01337-CV
10/04/2011
Miscellaneous civil
Wholesale TV and Radio Advertising, LLC
Better Business Bureau of Metropolitan Dallas, Inc.
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
03/12/2012 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellee | |
01/12/2012 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellant | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
08/26/2013 | Mandate issued |
| |||||
06/14/2013 | Memorandum opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||||
06/14/2013 | Retention time case file will be retained | Destroy | | ||||
02/26/2013 | Submitted | | |||||
02/04/2013 | Letter filed |
| |||||
01/15/2013 | Set for submission on oral argument | | |||||
03/12/2012 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | | |||||
03/12/2012 | Brief Due | | |||||
03/12/2012 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
02/11/2012 | Brief Due | | |||||
01/30/2012 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
01/27/2012 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||||
01/20/2012 | Supplemental Clerk's Record Filed | | |||||
01/12/2012 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | | |||||
01/12/2012 | Brief Due | | |||||
12/13/2011 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |||||
11/29/2011 | Record due | | |||||
11/07/2011 | Reporter's Record Filed | | |||||
10/13/2011 | Docketing Statement Filed | | |||||
10/04/2011 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals | | |||||
10/04/2011 | Docketing Statement Notice | | |||||
10/04/2011 | $175 filing fee due | | |||||
09/30/2011 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
09/30/2011 | Judgment Entered by the Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
06/14/2019 | Retention | Date civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate) |
08/26/2013 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Better Business Bureau of Metropolitan Dallas, Inc. | Appellee | David C. Myers |
Wholesale TV and Radio Advertising, LLC | Appellant | Shae Armstrong |
Trial Court Information
14th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Eric Moye
11-08382-A
Diane L. Robert