judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-8521
A-8521
07/10/1961
Application for Writ of Error
LAWSON CEMETERY ASSOCIATION
JAMES OTIS VAUGHAN
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/31/1961Motion for RehearingPetitioner
07/17/1961Reply to ResponsePetitioner
07/12/1961Response to PetitionRespondent
07/10/1961Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/06/1961Response to Motion filed
10/31/1961Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/17/1961Reply to Response
07/12/1961Response to Petition
07/10/1961Application for Writ of Error - FiledRefused
07/10/1961Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Lawson Cemetery AssociationPetitioner
James Otis VaughanRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information