judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TAYLOR (JASON) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38179
Short Caption:TAYLOR (JASON) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 44062
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C139686Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/10/2003How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/17/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/17/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-12098
07/30/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 3/20/01 and ending 03/30/01; and 06/11/01. To Court Reporter: Yvonne Valentin; Jo Ann Orduna; and Dina Dalton. 01-12823
07/30/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 11/20/97; 01/22/98; and 01/06/00. To Court Reporters: Shirlee Prawalsky; Karen Malmsten; and Debra Van Blairicom. 01-12824
07/30/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-12825
08/10/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: January 6, 2000. Court Reporter: Debra Van Blaricom. 01-13624
08/10/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: February 3, 2000. Court Reporter: Shirlee Prawalsky. 01-13625
08/14/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Amended Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 1/6/00 and 2/3/00. To Court Reporter: Shirlee Prawalsky. 01-13800
09/06/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: March 26, 27, 28, 29 & 30. Court Reporter: JoAnn Orduna. 01-15035
10/18/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: June 11, 2001. Court Reporter: Dina Dee Dalton. 01-17594
10/29/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: January 6, 2000. Court Reporter: Debra Van Blaricom. 01-18095
11/08/2001MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: December 10, 2001. 01-18647
12/13/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (90 day extension) 01-20947
03/12/2002MotionFiled Motion. Application for Extension of Time and Order to Show Cause. 02-04460
03/20/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On December 13, 2001, appellant filed a motion entitled "Application for Extension of Time and Order to Show Cause." Appellant requests a 90 day extension of time to file and serve the opening brief and appendix, and the issuance of an order directing "the court reporter here involved" to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to prepare and file requested transcripts. We note that appellant has filed three different transcript request forms with this court. We note that five of the court reporters named in appellant's transcript request forms have filed various certified copies of transcripts for some of the dates requested by appellant. We further note that a review of the district court docket entries shows that many transcripts were filed in the district court during the proceedings. Because it is unclear what, if any, transcripts are required for the briefing of this appeal that have not yet been prepared and filed, appellant shall file either the transcript request form or a certificate indicating that no further transcripts need be prepared within 10 days form the date of this order. In light of this order, we grant appellant's motion filed December 13, 2001, in part. Appellant shall file and serve the opening brief and appendix within 60 days from the date of this order. We deny appellant's request for an order directing a court reporter to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to prepare and file requested transcripts and we deny appellant's March 12, 2002, motion. After the filing of the opening brief, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 02-04961
04/02/2002Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. No further transcripts of proceedings are requested. 02-05835
06/24/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, appellant has failed to file the opening brief and appendix. Appellant shall have 20 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 02-10827
07/22/2002MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: July 22, 2002. 02-12520
07/22/2002BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 07/19/02. 02-12523
07/22/2002AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 02-12524
08/23/2002BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. 02-14490
10/04/2002MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 02-17174
10/08/2002Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed October 4, 2002. The clerk shall file the reply brief received on October 4, 2002. 02-17333
10/08/2002BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. 02-17175
03/10/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 03-03917
03/10/2003Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. To the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP03-MS/ML/NB
04/08/2003Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the district court's judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP03-MS/ML/NB 03-05896
05/06/2003RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 03-06256
05/06/2003Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/14/2003RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 9, 2003. 03-06256